skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 16:10:58 PM

Wallis, Christopher James Derrick

CPSO#: 96028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray St
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8867 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher J.D. Wallis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wallis ( CPSO# 96028 )

Business Address:
60 Murray St
Koffler Centre, 6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: 416-586-8867

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES DERRICK WALLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2021