THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:27:24 AM
Thakrar, Dipen Ramniklal
CPSO#:
96026
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 9055768711
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIPEN RAMNIKLAL THAKRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKRAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Jul 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2018 |