THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:38:21 AM
van der Pol, Christian Balthasar
CPSO#:
95958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
North of Superior Healthcare Group-Wilson Memorial General H,ospital |
Marathon |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN BALTHASAR VAN DER POL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER POL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2016 |