THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:00:15 AM
Parvez, Elena
CPSO#:
95945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Cent
Department of Surgery
B3-155
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 72617
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Jul 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELENA PARVEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARVEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2016 |