skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 11:01:19 AM

Abdirahman, Ifrah Hussein

CPSO#: 95939

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2019
EXPIRY DATE
09 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Nov 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2019