THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:22:00 PM
Jansen, Marcus Cole
CPSO#:
95921
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Synergy
Sports Medicine & Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON M6H1V5
Phone: 416-703-3525
Fax: 647-343-8073
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCUS COLE JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2013 |