skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 3:56:24 AM

Bailey, Kristy Elisa

CPSO#: 95906

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FCP Dermatology
100 King St W
Concourse Level
Toronto ON  M5X 1A9
Phone: (416) 861-8600
Fax: (416) 861-8607 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kristy Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bailey ( CPSO# 95906 )

Business Address:
100 King Street West
Suite CN0110
Toronto ON  M5X 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 861-8600

Business Address:
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Suite 8
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone Number: (647) 351-9277

Business Address:
150 York Street
Suit 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTY ELISA BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016