skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 0:00:00 AM

Sogbein, Oyebola Olusegun

CPSO#: 95845

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 College Dr
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Diagnostic Services
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: 7054748600 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oyebola Olusegun Sogbein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Sogbein ( CPSO# 95845 )

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
Nuclear Medicine Residency Program
263 McCaul Street, 4rth Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone Number: (613) 853-2234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OYEBOLA OLUSEGUN SOGBEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOGBEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019