THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:36:52 PM
Toeg, Hadi Daood Edward
CPSO#:
95839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst
H1258
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6136967000
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HADI DAOOD EDWARD TOEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOEG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2019 |