skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 16:59:46 PM

Madhvani, Amar Ashwin

CPSO#: 95826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Wellington St W
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Phone: 705-739-0127 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

799 Bloor Street W
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Canada
Phone: (647) 349-0053
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3131 8th Line
Bradford ON  L3Z 4H2
Canada
Phone: 905-775-1700
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

1118 Centre Street
Unit 19
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 479-9902
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amar Madhvani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Madhvani ( CPSO# 95826 )
Dr. A. Madhvani ( CPSO# 105064)

Business Address:
200 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Phone Number: (705) 739-0127

Business Address:
19-1118 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 479-9902

Business Address:
799 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Phone Number: (647) 349-0053

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMAR ASHWIN MADHVANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADHVANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013