skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 4:27:27 AM

Zhang, Qi

CPSO#: 95811

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Medical College of QingDao University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36341
Fax: (519) 663-2930 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Qi Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Zhang ( CPSO# 95811 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective:24 Apr 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QI ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neuropathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
CF - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017