skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/10/21 3:29:59 AM

Erdman, Sarah Ellen

CPSO#: 95745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Constellation Dr
Ottawa Public Health
Nepean ON  K2G 6J8
Phone: 613-580-6744 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:25 Oct 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH ELLEN ERDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 11 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 23 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Oct 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2021 to 25 Oct 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2021