THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:25:29 AM
Dziak, Peter Michael
CPSO#:
95744
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Dziak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2019
Corporation Name: Peter Dziak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 26, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 17, 2018, Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre (SLHC) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that the locum privileges held by Dr. Peter Dziak at SLHC were suspended effective November 26, 2018, and that his appointment at SLHC terminated effective December 31, 2018.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL DZIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZIAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2024 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Peter Michael Dziak’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that, on or about March 23, 2021, Dr. Dziak was found guilty of offences relevant to his suitability to practice medicine, namely: criminal harassment against complainant “X” and failing to comply with an undertaking. It is further alleged that Dr. Dziak engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, as well as conduct unbecoming a physician, by: engaging in repeated, unwanted communications with X; on multiple occasions, threatening to carry out physical and sexual violence against X and other individuals; making threats of violence and racist comments toward X’s partner; and stalking the residence of X and her partner.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: February 9, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Peter Dziak was found guilty of the following offences:
1. Criminal Harassment, contrary to Section 264(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Failing to comply with an undertaking to an officer, contrary to Section 145(5.1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: March 23, 2021
SENTENCE:
1. Conditional Discharge, with three years probation with conditions (see below).
2. 10 year prohibition on possession of weapons listed in s. 109 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Comply with a DNA Order under the Criminal Code of Canada.
Probation Conditions:
1. During the first 12 months, Dziak will report to a probation officer at least once per month, and thereafter as required.
2. Dziak will have no contact, direct or indirect, with named persons.
3. Dziak will remain at least 1 kilometer away from where named persons live, work, study, worship or are otherwise known to be.
4. Dziak will attend for assessments, counseling, or rehabilitative programs at the direction of the probation officer and sign releases allowing for monitoring.
5. Dziak will not possess any weapons as defined by the Criminal Code.
6. During the first six months of the probationary period, Dziak will abide by a curfew from 10pm to 6am each and every day, except in the event of a medical emergency involving himself or a member of his immediate family.