THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:22:53 PM
Das, Lopamudra
CPSO#:
95741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-25 Industrial St
Kindercare Pediatrics
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 416-848-7665
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Dec 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOPAMUDRA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2015 |