skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 10:14:02 AM

Brecher, Emily Rachel Plewik

CPSO#: 95729

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sexual Health Clinic
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: (613) 560-6096 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Health and Coun
CTTC Building
Suite 2600
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: 613-520-6674
Fax: 613-520-4059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brecher Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lin ( CPSO# 93399 )
Dr. E. Brecher ( CPSO# 95729 )

Business Address:
1125 Colonel By Dr
Carleton University Health and Counselling Service
CTTC Building
Suite 2600
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: 613-520-6674

Business Address:
Sexual Health Centre
Ottawa Public Health
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Phone Number: (613) 234-4641

Business Address:
Suite 303
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3

Business Address:
Suite 201
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-8262

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY RACHEL PLEWIK BRECHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRECHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2014