THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:27:32 PM
Wong-Chong, Nathalie
CPSO#:
95674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 603
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-4448
Fax: (905) 853-7411
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Colorectal Surgery |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHALIE WONG-CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG-CHONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2017 |