skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 10:06:30 AM

Nabavi Nouri, Maryam

CPSO#: 95659

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Toronto ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8332 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Nabavi Nouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nabavi Nouri ( CPSO# 95659 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARYAM NABAVI NOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABAVI NOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2018 to 04 Sep 2018
EL - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016