skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 6:52:48 AM

Evans, Andrea Blair

CPSO#: 95580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-5550 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans ( CPSO# 95580 )
Dr. A. Caudarella ( CPSO# 97953 )

Business Address:
555 University
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA BLAIR EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015