THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:35:39 AM
Lee, Edwin
CPSO#:
95563
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Upper Ottawa Medical Clinic
2-1447 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 389-4976
Fax: (905) 389-2326
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2014 |