THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:23:53 AM
Sadashiva, Ramya
CPSO#:
95547
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Mysore University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ramya Sadashiva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medmart Medical Centre
54 King Street East
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1K2
Date Received: 22 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2017 |