THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:56:05 AM
Oluyole, Oluwakemi Oluwafunmilola
CPSO#:
95533
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: American University Of Antigua, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Oluwakemi Oluyole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:203 - 316 King St E
Cobourg, ON K9A 5W9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2018 |