skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/07/21 14:55:54 PM

Jacoby, Lynn Marie

CPSO#: 95520

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical Group 104-1902 Robertson Rd Ottawa ON K2H 5B8
Date Received: 31 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Dec 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017