skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 14:00:04 PM

Grebenyuk, Liliya

CPSO#: 95519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kazakh State Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
Phone: 519-766-1360
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Liliya Grebenyuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grebenyuk ( CPSO# 95519 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 760-1366

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LILIYA GREBENYUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREBENYUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2014