THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:31:09 PM
Khan, James Shiraz
CPSO#:
95509
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Rm 20-400
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES SHIRAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 31 Mar 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2018 |