THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:43:42 AM
Zymantas, Jennifer Ann Carla
CPSO#:
95505
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Hospitalist
2nd floor
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7147
Fax: 705-671-7392
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN CARLA ZYMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZYMANTAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |