skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 20:11:20 PM

Sutherland, Jason Scott

CPSO#: 95501

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Sutherland, Jason (used until: 28 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Notre Dame Ave
Unit C
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone: 705-560-1018
Fax: 705-566-7617 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. S. Sutherland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sutherland ( CPSO# 95501 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit C
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON SCOTT SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013