THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:49:45 AM
Nikonova, Anna S
CPSO#:
95438
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nikonova, Anna (used until: 29 Jun 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Russian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nikonova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:04 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 12 Dec 2014
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |