THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:55:53 AM
Laing, Courtney Lynn
CPSO#:
95393
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5115 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8T 1C2
Phone: (519) 258-3200
Fax: (519) 258-0245
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Courtney Laing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 28 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COURTNEY LYNN LAING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Aug 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |