THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:37:47 AM
Gimbel, Sarah Anne
CPSO#:
95390
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
New Vision Family Health Team
Unit 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE GIMBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIMBEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2013 |