THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:43:20 PM
Frackowiak, Damian
CPSO#:
95363
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The North Oakville Medical Centre
Rheumatology Clinic
402-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 847-2211
Fax: (905) 847-2214
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:27 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAMIAN FRACKOWIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRACKOWIAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2015 |