THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:44:07 AM
Bastianelli, Paul Anthony Roy
CPSO#:
95349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Phone: 6132261912
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY ROY BASTIANELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTIANELLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Jan 2017
CF - Ophthalmology