THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:07:21 AM
Peacock, Sharon
CPSO#:
95344
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sinai Health System
600 University Ave
Anesthesia Department
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON PEACOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEACOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |