skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 19:04:31 PM

Rycroft, Jennifer Elizabeth

CPSO#: 95335

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: 905-563-0933 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer Rycroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rycroft ( CPSO# 95335 )

Business Address:
Beamsville Medical Centre
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 5J5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ELIZABETH RYCROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYCROFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2014