skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/07/21 14:55:07 PM

Klair, Amandeep Kiddy

CPSO#: 95300

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Klair, Amandeep Kiddy (used until: 13 Apr 2021 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Runnymede Health Care Centre
625 Runnymede Rd
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Suite 2129
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amandeep Klair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klair ( CPSO# 95300 )

Business Address:
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Phone Number: (416) 762-7316

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Mar 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDEEP KIDDY KLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2021