THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:17:34 AM
Corrigan, Gina Rita
CPSO#:
95275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9999 Stn Main
Garrison Petawawa
2 Field Ambulance Medical Clinic
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Phone: 613-687-5511 Ext. 242-4197
Fax: 613-588-6093
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Sep 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GINA RITA CORRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2013 |