THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:07:12 PM
Mundi, Raman
CPSO#:
95218
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
43 Wellesley St E
Sunnybrook Holland Orthopaedic & Ar
Orthopaedic Surgery
Suite 320
Toronto ON M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416-967-8778
Fax: 416-967-8780
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:31 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMAN MUNDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2018 |