skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 6:57:39 AM

Murugesupillai, Nirosala

CPSO#: 95205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nirosala Murugesupillai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Murugesupillai ( CPSO# 95205 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Center
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIROSALA MURUGESUPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGESUPILLAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014