skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 11:33:15 AM

Mir Ghassemi, Asadollah

CPSO#: 95204

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Corporation Name: Mir Ghassemi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. M. Abtahi ( CPSO# 98739 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169


Corporation Name: Maryam Abtahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 25 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASADOLLAH MIR GHASSEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR GHASSEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016