skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 10:46:00 AM

Mai, Lauren Marie

CPSO#: 95190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Davies, Lauren Marie (used until: 03 Aug 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Rd
P.O. Box 5339
L H S C University Hospital
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3168
Fax: (519) 663-3169 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAUREN MARIE MAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2019