skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 16:40:58 PM

Clancy, Aisling Anne

CPSO#: 95188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campu
Urogynecology Clinic
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 7388400 Ext. 81725 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Canada
Fax: (613) 722-1310
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AISLING ANNE CLANCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLANCY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016