skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 6:55:24 AM

Adelstein, Mitchell Steven

CPSO#: 95171

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Boston University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1NE 126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mitchell Adelstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adelstein ( CPSO# 95171 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 1NE 126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012 Active
             Dr.  Mitchell Steven Adelstein may practise medicine independently in emergency
            medicine, only.