THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:42:59 AM
Tsang, Derek Siu Chung
CPSO#:
95166
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
OPG 7-316
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-946-2919
Fax: 419-946-4442
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEREK SIU CHUNG TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2017 |