THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:52:00 AM
Jayatilaka, Padmali Udayani
CPSO#:
95157
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala
Education: University of Colombo, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON N6K 1M6
Phone: 5196416712
Fax: 5196416189
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Feb 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PADMALI UDAYANI JAYATILAKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYATILAKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 05 Nov 2018 to 01 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 May 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2019 |