THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:04:05 PM
Cheung, Edward Man-Tsun
CPSO#:
95151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8440 112 St NW
University of Alberta Hospital
Dept. of Radiology and Diagnostic I
2A2.41 WC Mackenzie Health Sciences
Edmonton AB T6G 2B7
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD MAN-TSUN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2021 |