THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:29:59 PM
Inbar-Feigenberg, Michal
CPSO#:
95141
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div Clinical and Metabolic Genetics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8511
Fax: 416-8134940
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 Sep 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Sep 2016
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |