THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:03:39 AM
Gholami, Sogand
CPSO#:
95130
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Gholami Ghasemabadi, Sogand (used until: 28 Apr 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10376 Yonge St
Unit # 106
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: 905-237-0165
Fax: 905-237-0153
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Mar 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOGAND GHOLAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2014 |