THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:31:13 PM
Dowhaniuk, Jenna Katherine
CPSO#:
95090
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
2N49
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905 521 2655
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:27 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNA KATHERINE DOWHANIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWHANIUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2015 |