THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:25:55 AM
Luong, Michael Wing Fai
CPSO#:
95074
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
27 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2017 to 27 Oct 2017
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2017 |