THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:00:56 PM
Griller, Nadia Leah
CPSO#:
95061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
H339-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 1978
Fax: 4164804845
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Griller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 25 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:23 Feb 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADIA LEAH GRILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |