skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 5:36:03 AM

Mertz, Dominik

CPSO#: 95042

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Basel, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Infection Prevention and Control
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43952
Fax: (905) 577-1415 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D. Mertz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mertz ( CPSO# 95042 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
Infection Prevention and Control
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Switzerland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Dominik Mertz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of Infectious Diseases, McMaster University, in which Dr.
                        Mertz holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Mertz  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.